House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2195 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development | Journal Page: 638 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 638 | |
House | 02/27/2023 | Filed |