Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1703 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3860 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3575 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1345 | Journal Page: 3575 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3575 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3575 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1288 | Journal Page: 3439 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3439 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3439 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2468 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 639 | |
House | 02/27/2023 | Filed |