E
|
06/02/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/02/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/18/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2051
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4549
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4274
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4275
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1705
|
Journal Page: 4275
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4274
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3857
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hall
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#345
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 641
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|