Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB290 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2023