House | 05/10/2023 | Postponed | 2/17/24 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3679 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 643 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 643 | |
House | 02/27/2023 | Filed |