E
|
06/18/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
E
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5614
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1922
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
House
|
05/07/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3289
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1199
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3187
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1157
|
Journal Page: 3186
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3186
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Shine
|
Journal Page: 3186
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3186
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2342
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 645
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|