Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2972 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/28/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R2905 EAS-F
 By: A. Johnson of Harris H.B. No. 2972


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to persons who are acquitted by reason of insanity in a
 criminal case.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 46C.264, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Court-ordered [The court may order the] outpatient or
 community-based treatment and supervision may [to] be provided to
 the acquitted person only in a county in which [in any appropriate
 county where the] necessary resources are available and in which:
 (1)  the court is located; or
 (2)  the acquitted person:
 (A)  has a significant nexus to the county; and
 (B)  can be adequately supervised while
 maintaining the public safety of the community and the acquitted
 person.
 (a-1)  For purposes of this article, an acquitted person has
 a significant nexus to a county if a substantial connection exists
 between the acquitted person and the county, including a
 substantial connection based on the acquitted person having:
 (1)  a support network in that county, including family
 and friends; and
 (2)  previously received mental health services from
 the local mental health authority in that county in the five-year
 period preceding the date of the person's acquittal.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall conduct a study on persons who were, during the period
 beginning on September 1, 2005, and ending on August 31, 2024:
 (1)  found not guilty by reason of insanity; and
 (2)  ordered by the court to participate in outpatient
 or community-based treatment and supervision.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2024, the commission shall
 prepare and submit to the legislature a written report containing
 the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or
 other action.  The report must include the following, with regard to
 the acquitted persons who, during the applicable period described
 by Subsection (a) of this section, are ordered by the court to
 participate in outpatient or community-based treatment and
 supervision:
 (1)  a list of each county with regard to which
 acquitted persons are ordered to participate in treatment and
 supervision;
 (2)  the number of acquitted persons ordered to
 participate in treatment and supervision in:
 (A)  counties in which the court ordering the
 treatment and supervision is located; or
 (B)  counties other than the county in which the
 court ordering the treatment and supervision is located;
 (3)  the reasons acquitted persons are ordered to
 participate in treatment and supervision in a county described by
 Subdivision (2)(B) of this subsection;
 (4)  issues identified by treatment providers and other
 stakeholders concerning acquitted persons being ordered to
 participate in treatment and supervision in a county described by
 Subdivision (2)(B) of this subsection;
 (5)  information on whether there is sufficient funding
 for acquitted persons to participate in all types of outpatient
 treatment and supervision in this state; and
 (6)  a description of outcomes for acquitted persons
 participating in all types of outpatient treatment and supervision
 in this state.
 SECTION 3.  (a) The change in law made by this Act in
 amending Article 46C.264, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies to
 any defendant who is subject to proceedings under Chapter 46C, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, before, on, or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 5, Chapter 831 (S.B. 837), Acts
 of the 79th Legislature, Regular Session, 2005, for a person who
 committed any element of the offense before September 1, 2005,
 Chapter 46C, Code of Criminal Procedure, as amended by this Act,
 governs:
 (1)  an initial determination of not guilty by reason
 of insanity; and
 (2)  any subsequent proceedings that occur in relation
 to a determination of not guilty by reason of insanity made under
 Chapter 46C or former Article 46.03, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 applicable, including commitment hearings, recommitment hearings,
 and court orders requiring participation in outpatient or
 community-based treatment and supervision.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.