Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1505
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 647
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|