Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2996 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/11/2023 2:00 pm
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Postponed
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee