Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3015 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023