House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3770 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1439 | Journal Page: 3769 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3769 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 3769 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3769 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Postponed | 5/10/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3640 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3639 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Postponed | 5/9/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3446 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3446 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 312 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 312 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |