Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3033 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 27, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill May 7, 2023
Bill May 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 21, 2023
Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023