Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1743 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1743 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1660 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3714 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1251 | Journal Page: 3366 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3366 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3366 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3334 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3334 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1743 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Filed |