E
|
06/11/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/11/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5614
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
House
|
05/07/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1176
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3230
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3230
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3230
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|