House | 05/03/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2873 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1332 | Journal Page: 2872 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1395 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 653 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 653 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Filed |