E | 05/27/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/27/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6429 | |
E | 05/16/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4564 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1918 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4313 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4387 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4217 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1837 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1837 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1837 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1837 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1696 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1485 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1485 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1355 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | RV#546 | Journal Page: 2092 |
House | 04/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1708 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1485 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 654 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Filed |