Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3079 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/01/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R10358 KBB-D
 By: Walle H.B. No. 3079


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot program for the provision of free legal
 representation to certain indigent tenants in eviction suits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.943, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), funds in the basic
 civil legal services account may be used for the indigent tenant
 eviction representation pilot program established under Section
 2306.2591. The comptroller may pay money from the account for the
 indigent tenant eviction representation pilot program at the
 request of the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
 This subsection expires January 1, 2026.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter K, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.2591 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.2591.  INDIGENT TENANT EVICTION REPRESENTATION
 PILOT PROGRAM. (a) In this section, "pilot program" means the
 indigent tenant eviction representation pilot program established
 under this section.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, an individual is indigent
 if the individual's family income is at or below 80 percent of the
 area median family income, adjusted for household size, as
 determined annually by the United States Department of Housing and
 Urban Development, for the area in which the individual resides.
 (c)  The indigent tenant eviction representation pilot
 program is created in the department to provide legal
 representation to indigent individuals in eviction suits filed by
 landlords under Chapter 24, Property Code, or with respect to
 prospective eviction suits under that chapter.
 (d)  An indigent individual is eligible to receive legal
 representation provided by the pilot program if the individual is a
 residential tenant in a county with a population of 3.3 million or
 more and:
 (1)  has received a notice to vacate a premises under
 Section 24.005, Property Code;
 (2)  has been served in an eviction suit under Chapter
 24, Property Code; or
 (3)  has appealed the judgment of the justice court in a
 suit described by Subdivision (2).
 (e)  The pilot program shall develop and maintain a list of
 licensed attorneys to provide representation under the program.
 (f)  The department shall implement the pilot program using
 money in the basic civil legal services account created in Section
 51.943.
 (g)  The department shall make a reasonable effort to notify
 eligible individuals that the pilot program is available.
 (h)  The department shall prepare a report detailing the
 results of the pilot program and submit the report to the
 legislature not later than December 31, 2025.
 (i)  This section expires January 1, 2026.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 24, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 24.0041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 24.0041.  APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY FOR CERTAIN TENANTS.
 (a) On request, a justice court having jurisdiction of the eviction
 suit or the prospective eviction suit shall appoint an attorney
 from the list maintained by the indigent tenant eviction
 representation pilot program under Section 2306.2591, Government
 Code, to represent a tenant eligible for representation as
 described by that section.
 (b)  This section expires January 1, 2026.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Not later than January 1, 2024, the Texas
 Department of Housing and Community Affairs shall:
 (1)  adopt rules as necessary to implement Section
 2306.2591, Government Code, as added by this Act; and
 (2)  develop the list of attorneys required under
 Section 2306.2591(e), Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  This section takes effect September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 5.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect January 1, 2024.