LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB3120
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3120
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3120
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/20/2023
10:00 am
Ways & Means Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 140
HB159
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Left pending in committee
HB1417
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB2249
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/18/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB2354
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HB2674
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
HB2683
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB2691
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2763
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3120
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HJR132
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State