Senate | 05/21/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4151 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1625 | Journal Page: 4150 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 4150 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Amended | 2-Zwiener | Journal Page: 4150 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4150 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4020 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1567 | Journal Page: 4019 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 4019 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amended | 2-Cook | Journal Page: 4019 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amended 2-Cook | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) | Journal Page: 4019 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4018 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1959 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 660 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Filed |