House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 671 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 671 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Filed |