E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5973
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5297
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2751
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|