Senate | 05/11/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3759 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1431 | Journal Page: 3759 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3759 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3759 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3678 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3678 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3074 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 314 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 314 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |