E
|
06/14/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6422
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6428
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2140
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2425
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1689
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1689
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1614
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1107
|
Journal Page: 3108
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Record vote RV#1107
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3108
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3043
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1070
|
Journal Page: 3043
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3043
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3043
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1689
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 290
|
House
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|