Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3301 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 8, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 6, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023