Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported from s/c with no recommendation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#855
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|