Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB336 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/04/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
04/03/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
03/14/2023 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Considered in Calendars