Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3370 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/24/2023 8:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
03/27/2023 9:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Left pending in committee