Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported from s/c with no recommendation | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1867 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4152 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1626 | Journal Page: 4151 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4151 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4151 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4021 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4021 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3468 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1959 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 687 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |