LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB3389
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3389
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3389
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/01/2023
10:00 am
Ways & Means Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 140
HB654
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Finance
HB2655
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB2993
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
HB3003
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB3389
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB3691
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB4158
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
HB4250
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB4257
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB4463
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB348
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
SB1439
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor