Senate | 05/17/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2063 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1622 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3100 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1099 | Journal Page: 3099 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3099 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3099 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3030 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#1063 | Journal Page: 3029 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3029 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3029 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1691 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |