Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3444 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3444
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the classification of transportation districts by the
 Texas Transportation Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 201.105, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  The commission by rule shall prescribe criteria for the
 classification of each district as metropolitan, urban, or rural.
 The rules must classify a district with a population of more than
 one million as metropolitan.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Transportation Commission shall adopt the
 rules required by Section 201.105(h), Transportation Code, as added
 by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *