Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1308
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 291
|
House
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|