Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1316 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2196 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1974 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | RV#482 | Journal Page: 1973 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1973 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Record vote RV#482 | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Amended | 3-Leach | Journal Page: 1973 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Amended 3-Leach | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 1973 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1954 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-Leach | Journal Page: 1914 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Amendment amended | 2-Ortega | Journal Page: 1913 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Leach | Journal Page: 1912 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1911 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1396 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1357 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 713 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |