Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3507 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2023

                    By: Holland (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 3507
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 9, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 PerryX
 HancockX
 BlancoX
 FloresX
 GutierrezX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 SparksX
 SpringerX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to contracts for the construction, repair, and renovation
 of certain conservation and reclamation district facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 49.273(d) and (e), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  For contracts over $150,000 [$75,000], the board shall
 advertise the letting of the contract, including the general
 conditions, time, and place of opening of sealed bids.  The notice
 must be published in one or more newspapers circulated in each
 county in which the district is located. If there are more than
 four counties in the district, notice may be published in any
 newspaper with general circulation in the district.  The notice
 must be published once a week for two consecutive weeks before the
 date that the bids are opened, and the first publication must be not
 later than the 14th day before the date of the opening of the sealed
 bids.
 (e)  For contracts over $25,000 but not more than $150,000
 [$75,000], the board shall solicit written competitive bids on
 uniform written specifications from at least three bidders.
 SECTION 2.  Section 49.273, Water Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies only to a contract for which a governmental entity
 first advertises or otherwise requests bids, proposals, offers, or
 qualifications, or makes a similar solicitation, on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *