Senate | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1506 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2624 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2617 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#791 | Journal Page: 2624 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2624 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2624 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2596 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2596 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/06/2023 | Filed |