Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3547 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/17/2023 11:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Finance
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Received from the House