Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3569 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 88R12928 BDP-D
22 By: Allison H.B. No. 3569
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to authorizing cost-of-living adjustments applicable to
88 certain benefits paid by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 824, Government Code, is
1111 amended by adding Section 824.703 to read as follows:
1212 Sec. 824.703. ADDITIONAL COST-OF-LIVING ADJUSTMENT.
1313 (a) Notwithstanding Section 824.702 and subject to Section
1414 821.006, the retirement system shall make a one-time cost-of-living
1515 adjustment payable to annuitants receiving a monthly death or
1616 retirement benefit annuity, as provided by this section.
1717 (b) Subject to Subsections (c) and (d), to be eligible for
1818 the adjustment, a person must be, on the effective date of the
1919 adjustment and disregarding any forfeiture of benefits under
2020 Section 824.601, an annuitant eligible to receive:
2121 (1) a standard service or disability retirement
2222 annuity payment;
2323 (2) an optional service or disability retirement
2424 annuity payment as either a retiree or beneficiary;
2525 (3) an annuity payment under Section 824.402(a)(3) or
2626 (4);
2727 (4) an annuity payment under Section 824.502; or
2828 (5) an alternate payee annuity payment under Section
2929 804.005.
3030 (c) If the annuitant:
3131 (1) is a retiree or is a beneficiary under an optional
3232 retirement payment plan, to be eligible for the adjustment under
3333 this section:
3434 (A) the annuitant must be living on the effective
3535 date of the adjustment; and
3636 (B) the effective date of the retirement of the
3737 member of the retirement system must have been on or before August
3838 31, 2021;
3939 (2) is a beneficiary under Section 824.402(a)(3) or
4040 (4) or 824.502, to be eligible for the adjustment:
4141 (A) the annuitant must be living on the effective
4242 date of the adjustment; and
4343 (B) the date of death of the member of the
4444 retirement system must have been on or before August 31, 2021; or
4545 (3) is an alternate payee under Section 804.005, the
4646 annuitant is eligible for the adjustment only if the effective date
4747 of the election to receive the annuity payment was on or before
4848 August 31, 2021.
4949 (d) An adjustment made under this section does not apply to
5050 payments under:
5151 (1) Section 824.203(d), relating to retirees who
5252 receive a standard service retirement annuity in an amount fixed by
5353 statute;
5454 (2) Section 824.304(a), relating to disability
5555 retirees with less than 10 years of service credit;
5656 (3) Section 824.304(b)(2), relating to disability
5757 retirees who receive a disability annuity in an amount fixed by
5858 statute;
5959 (4) Section 824.404(a), relating to active member
6060 survivor beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity in an amount
6161 fixed by statute;
6262 (5) Section 824.501(a), relating to retiree survivor
6363 beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity in an amount fixed by
6464 statute; or
6565 (6) Section 824.804(b), relating to participants in
6666 the deferred retirement option plan with regard to payments from
6767 their deferred retirement option plan accounts.
6868 (e) An adjustment under this section:
6969 (1) must be made beginning with an annuity payable for
7070 the month of September 2023; and
7171 (2) is limited to:
7272 (A) an amount equal to 10 times the member's
7373 years of service in the retirement system if, as applicable, the
7474 effective date of the retirement of the member, the date of death of
7575 the member, or the effective date of the election to receive the
7676 annuity payment under Section 804.005 was on or before August 31,
7777 2005;
7878 (B) an amount equal to eight times the member's
7979 years of service in the retirement system if, as applicable, the
8080 effective date of the retirement of the member, the date of death of
8181 the member, or the effective date of the election to receive the
8282 annuity payment under Section 804.005 was after August 31, 2005,
8383 but on or before August 31, 2010;
8484 (C) an amount equal to six times the member's
8585 years of service in the retirement system if, as applicable, the
8686 effective date of the retirement of the member, the date of death of
8787 the member, or the effective date of the election to receive the
8888 annuity payment under Section 804.005 was after August 31, 2010,
8989 but on or before August 31, 2015;
9090 (D) an amount equal to four times the member's
9191 years of service in the retirement system if, as applicable, the
9292 effective date of the retirement of the member, the date of death of
9393 the member, or the effective date of the election to receive the
9494 annuity payment under Section 804.005 was after August 31, 2015,
9595 but on or before August 31, 2020; or
9696 (E) an amount equal to two times the member's
9797 years of service in the retirement system if, as applicable, the
9898 effective date of the retirement of the member, the date of death of
9999 the member, or the effective date of the election to receive the
100100 annuity payment under Section 804.005 was after August 31, 2020,
101101 but on or before August 31, 2023.
102102 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
103103 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
104104 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
105105 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
106106 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.