House | 05/11/2023 | Postponed | 5/11/24 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3962 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3962 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Postponed | 5/11/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3386 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3385 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Postponed | 5/8/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2549 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2549 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 721 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 721 | |
House | 03/06/2023 | Filed |