Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3615 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2023

                    By: Lambert (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3615
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2023;
 May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 4;
 May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3615 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to surcharges imposed for the use of a credit card.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 604A.0021, Business & Commerce Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Chapter 604A, Business & Commerce
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 604A.  PROHIBITION OR REGULATION OF CERTAIN SURCHARGES
 SECTION 3.  Section 604A.003, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 604A.003.  CIVIL PENALTY.  (a)  A person who knowingly
 violates Section 604A.002 [or 604A.0021] is liable to the state for
 a civil penalty in an amount not to exceed $500 for each violation.
 The attorney general or the prosecuting attorney in the county in
 which the violation occurs may bring:
 (1)  a suit to recover the civil penalty imposed under
 this section; and
 (2)  an action in the name of the state to restrain or
 enjoin a person from violating this chapter.
 (b)  Before bringing the action, the attorney general or
 prosecuting attorney shall give the person notice of the person's
 noncompliance and liability for a civil penalty. The notice must:
 (1)  contain guidance to assist the person in complying
 with this chapter;
 (2)  advise the person of the prohibitions under
 Section [Sections] 604A.002 [and 604A.0021]; and
 (3)  state that the person may be liable for a civil
 penalty for a subsequent violation of Section 604A.002 [or
 604A.0021].
 (b-1)  If the person complies with Section [Sections]
 604A.002 [and 604A.0021] not later than the 30th day after the date
 of the notice under Subsection (b), the violation is cured and the
 person is not liable for the civil penalty. A person who has
 previously received notice of noncompliance under Subsection (b) is
 not entitled to notice of or the opportunity to cure a subsequent
 violation of Section 604A.002 [or 604A.0021].
 (c)  The attorney general or the prosecuting attorney, as
 appropriate, is entitled to recover reasonable expenses incurred in
 obtaining injunctive relief, civil penalties, or both, under this
 section, including reasonable attorney's fees, court costs, and
 investigatory costs.
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 604A, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Section 604A.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 604A.004.  IMPOSITION OF SURCHARGE FOR USE OF CREDIT
 CARD.  (a)  A merchant may impose a surcharge on a buyer who uses a
 credit card for an extension of credit instead of cash, a check, or
 a similar means of payment to pay for the purchase of goods or
 services.  The buyer is obligated to pay any surcharge imposed on
 the credit extension transaction under this section.
 (b)  A surcharge imposed under this section may not exceed
 the amount necessary to offset the cost to the merchant of accepting
 credit cards.
 (c)  Before a merchant may impose a surcharge under this
 section, the merchant must provide to a buyer who uses a credit card
 for an extension of credit a disclosure stating: "Customers who pay
 with a credit card are responsible for the payment of a surcharge
 that won't exceed what's necessary to cover our costs for accepting
 credit cards.".
 (d)  A merchant who imposes a surcharge under this section
 must disclose the surcharge on the receipt or other statement of
 purchase given to the buyer.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *