Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3615 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 12, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 22, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023