Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3625 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 27, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023