E
|
06/11/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/11/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2029
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4473
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1800
|
Journal Page: 4473
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4473
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 LaMantia
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#345
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 725
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|