House | 04/14/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 726 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 726 | |
House | 03/06/2023 | Filed |