E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6485
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6488
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 126
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 126
|
Journal Page: 6421
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6428
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 717
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3241
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6420
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6414
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2507
|
Journal Page: 6409
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5893
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5893
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3003
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3003
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5451
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5451
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5451
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4983
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2283
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2283
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2283
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2283
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2283
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3509
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1308
|
Journal Page: 3509
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote RV#1308
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3509
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3480
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3480
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|