E
|
06/10/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/10/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/24/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5620
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2189
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1890
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4607
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1927
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3578
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1346
|
Journal Page: 3577
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3577
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3442
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended
|
1-C.J. Harris
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 742
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|