Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB377 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/14/2022

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R1039 BDP-D
 By: Bucy H.B. No. 377


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a joint select committee to study the
 feasibility and sustainability of providing a cost-of-living
 adjustment applicable to certain benefits paid by the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "committee" means the
 joint select committee established under Section 2 of this Act.
 SECTION 2.  JOINT SELECT COMMITTEE. (a) A joint select
 committee is established for the purposes of this Act and is
 composed of the following members:
 (1)  two members of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (2)  two members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (3)  one member of the public who is appointed by the
 lieutenant governor from lists of names submitted by stakeholder
 groups; and
 (4)  one member of the public who is appointed by the
 speaker of the house of representatives from lists of names
 submitted by stakeholder groups.
 (b)  The lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
 representatives shall make the appointments required under
 Subsection (a) of this section as soon as possible after the
 effective date of this Act, but not later than November 1, 2023.
 (c)  If a vacancy occurs, the appropriate appointing officer
 shall appoint a person to serve for the remainder of the unexpired
 term in the same manner as the original appointment.
 SECTION 3.  PRESIDING OFFICER; MEETINGS. (a) The
 lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of representatives
 shall jointly select the presiding officer of the committee.
 (b)  The committee shall convene at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 SECTION 4.  COOPERATION OF STATE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT, OR
 OFFICE. If needed to perform the duties of the committee, the
 committee may request the assistance of a state agency, department,
 or office. The state agency, department, or office shall provide
 the committee with the requested assistance.
 SECTION 5.  EXPENSES. (a) Each member of the committee is
 entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses
 incurred in performing committee duties.
 (b)  Each legislative member is entitled to reimbursement
 from the appropriate fund of the member's respective house.
 (c)  Each public member is entitled to reimbursement from
 funds appropriated to the committee.
 SECTION 6.  COMMITTEE POWERS AND DUTIES; STUDY. (a) The
 committee shall study the feasibility and sustainability of
 providing a cost-of-living adjustment payable to annuitants
 receiving a retirement benefit annuity under the Teacher Retirement
 System of Texas. The study must seek to identify and recommend a
 financial structure capable of providing the cost-of-living
 adjustment.
 (b)  The committee has all other powers and duties provided
 to a special or select committee by the rules of the senate and
 house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301, Government
 Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees on
 administration.
 SECTION 7.  REPORT. Not later than September 1, 2024, the
 committee shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 and the speaker of the house of representatives a report of the
 committee's findings and recommendations under this Act.
 SECTION 8.  ABOLITION OF COMMITTEE; EXPIRATION. The
 committee is abolished and this Act expires September 15, 2024.
 SECTION 9.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023.