Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1757 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3754 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1426 | Journal Page: 3753 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3753 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3753 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3754 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1400 | Journal Page: 3672 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3672 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Amendment fails of adoption | 2-Tinderholt | Journal Page: 3671 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Amended | 1-Guillen | Journal Page: 3670 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3670 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 743 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Filed |