House | 05/05/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3167 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1577 | Journal Page: 3166 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 751 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 751 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Filed |