House | 05/11/2023 | Postponed | 1/1/24 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 4042 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4042 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2791 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 319 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 319 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |