E
|
06/12/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/28/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3177
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5890
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5896
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5298
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2241
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3902
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1516
|
Journal Page: 3901
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3901
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3901
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3825
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Raney
|
Journal Page: 3825
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3825
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|